ESSEX RESPITE & CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RESPITE AND SUPPORT TO CARERS OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS IN ESSEX
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 20 December 1995: Standard registration
- ESSEX RESPITE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- MID ESSEX RESPITE CARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert William Barclay | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roxanne Marie Salvage | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Davies | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian King | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Stephen Page | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.11k | £228.28k | £215.57k | £281.78k | £350.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.93k | £203.85k | £238.11k | £277.17k | £284.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.78k | N/A | £75 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/11/2012 as amended on 24 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS LIVING WITH MENTAL ILLNESS AND PROVIDE RESPITE SUPPORT FOR THEIR CARERS.
Area of benefit
MID AND WEST ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1
Well Lane Industrial Estate
Well Lane
Danbury
CHELMSFORD
CM3 4AB
- Phone:
- 01245353855
- Email:
- office@essexrespite.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window