Accounts and annual returns THE SPEARS GAMES ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1051615
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 28 November 2013 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 10 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required