Financial history THE SPEARS GAMES ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1051615
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £3.63k £483 £348 £231 £1.29k
Total expenditure £4.19k £1.17k £373 £0 £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A