THE SPEARS GAMES ARCHIVE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity maintains and makes available to the public an archive of games and occupational toys made by J W Spear and Sons throughout its 100-year-plus history, together with catalogues, photographs, documents etc, and researches and gives information on the company and its products.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 December 1995: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.63k | £483 | £348 | £231 | £1.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £1.17k | £373 | £0 | £1.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 28 November 2013 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 10 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE ARTICLES AND THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME IN ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING IN PERPETUITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH AND SUBJECT TO THE POWERS AND PROVISIONS OF THIS DEED AN EXHIBITION AND LIBRARY FOR PROMOTING THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF THE HISTORY OF THE INVENTION MANUFACTURE AND DISTRIBUTION OF GAMES AND TOYS FOR THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING RESEARCH AND SCHOLARSHIP THEREIN (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE EXHIBITION AND LIBRARY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window