Trustees BOOTHVILLE PRIMARY SCHOOL AMENITIES FUND
Charity number: 1051617

Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucan Derick Burge | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Bradshaw | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Lilly Manning | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Josie Harcourt-Billingham | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rose Toomey | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ellen Tarry | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joydeep Bose | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wilderspin | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Robert Jones | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ruth Peart | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CROFT | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA PAYNE | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.