THE ARMY ROMAN CATHOLIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust facilitates the faith practice of Roman Catholic members of the Army, their families and those other Service personnel who wish to associate. It enables Chaplains to provide the best pastoral care and resources, and to engage people more deeply with the moral component of their military responsibilities. It supports the pastoral ministry of the Bishop of the Forces to those same people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 1995: Standard registration
- CAMPION FUND (Working name)
- THE ARMY RC TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER PAUL THORPE | Chair | 16 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Stephen Sharkey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Philip Michael Smith | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rt Rev Paul James Mason | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
COLONEL DOMINIC CHARLES MORGAN OBE | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
PETER FIRTH | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Maj Gen Seumas Kerr CBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.50k | £142.69k | £150.16k | £158.61k | £168.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.01k | £98.08k | £110.85k | £325.22k | £162.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 20TH JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 14 APRIL 2000, RESOLUTION 8/7/04 AND RESOLUTION 24/11/05
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AMONG OR IN CONNECTION WITH MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMY AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS IF ANY AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE WELFARE OF ROMAN CATHOLIC MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHAW GIBBS LIMITED
WEY COURT WEST
UNION ROAD
FARNHAM
GU9 7PT
- Phone:
- 01252711244
- Email:
- mdi@wiseandco.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window