Accounts and annual returns BUGUMA INTERNAL AFFAIRS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1051670
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 11 March 2013 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 09 April 2012 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required