Financial history BUGUMA INTERNAL AFFAIRS SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1051670
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £2.52k £4.40k £3.39k £3.78k £2.61k
Total expenditure £2.40k £360 £510 £510 £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A