Financial history THE WOODLANDS FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1051680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £170.09k £182.02k £149.79k £163.20k £175.25k
Total expenditure £187.83k £160.10k £169.36k £188.27k £185.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.67k N/A N/A £9.68k N/A