THE WOODLANDS FARM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating farm land and buildings for the promotion of conservation, sustainable farming and education for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR BARRY JAMES GRAY MA MD FRCP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James McGregor Woodrow | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Mary Jones | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Clive Blight | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivis Williams | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholas Howick | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hill | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Scholefield | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bryn Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE THUMWOOD-BROWNING | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.09k | £182.02k | £149.79k | £163.20k | £175.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.83k | £160.10k | £169.36k | £188.27k | £185.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.67k | N/A | N/A | £9.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1995 AND AMENDED 22 NOVEMBER 1995 BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF GREENWICH AND BEXLEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING SUCH INHABITANTS WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, AND PARTICULARLY OF THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO THAT END TO RECOGNISE AND PROMOTE THE RIGHTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE FULLY AND ACTIVELY IN THE DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF ANY PROJECTS CARRIED OUT BY THE COMPANY. (B) TO ADVANCE, FACILITATE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, COUNTRY LIFE, CONSERVATION, ECOLOGY, THE ENVIRONMENT AND RELATED TOPICS THROUGH THE ACQUISITION AND MANAGEMENT OF LAND, BUILDINGS AND OTHER PROPERTY SITUATE AT WOODLANDS FARM AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. (C) TO SEEK TO PRESERVE THE CHARACTER AND VISUAL AND OTHER AMENITIES OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND MAINTAIN OR ENHANCE THE ECOLOGICAL VALUE OF THE AREA.
Area of benefit
GREENWICH AND BEXLEY, WOODLANDS FARM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodlands Farm Trust
331 Shooters Hill
Welling
DA16 3RP
- Phone:
- 02083198900
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window