Trustees THE WOODLANDS FARM TRUST
Charity number: 1051680

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR BARRY JAMES GRAY MA MD FRCP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James McGregor Woodrow | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Mary Jones | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Clive Blight | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivis Williams | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholas Howick | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hill | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Scholefield | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bryn Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE THUMWOOD-BROWNING | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.