Accounts and annual returns ERITREAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION - UK

Charity number: 1051683
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 30 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 31 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 25 April 2013 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 28 May 2013 117 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 01 February 2012 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 01 February 2012 1 days late