BROMLEY COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bromley Council for Voluntary youth services administers a grant scheme on behalf of the local authority for rent, equipment and training. Bromley Council for voluntary youth services loans out grass sledges, badge making machines and presentation equipment as well as puts organisations into contact with each other for the loan of a variety of equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £25,000 from government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bromley
Governance
- 30 December 1995: Standard registration
- BROMLEY CVYS (Working name)
- BROMLEY YOUTH MATTERS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Thomas | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN HAMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.55k | £97.90k | £35.11k | £24.71k | £27.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.67k | £65.13k | £77.39k | £39.07k | £21.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 27 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY, PARTICULARLY THOSE YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 21 YEARS (INCLUSIVE), BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY YOUTH ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN OR VISITING THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION SO THAT THE YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROMLEY C V Y S
P O BOX 44
WEST WICKHAM
KENT
BR4 0QE
- Phone:
- 02084027395
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window