HEADS ON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Heads On we do everything we can to make things better for the people who come to Sussex Partnership for help, by providing funding for special projects, patient and family support, pioneering research and the transformation of your local mental health hospitals into more comfortable and welcoming environments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 2004: Standard registration
- 03 November 2006: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £336.32k | £496.47k | £1.90m | £460.44k | £468.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.22k | £390.34k | £903.88k | £525.71k | £762.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.89m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £10.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £763.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £140.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £9.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BEXHILL CMHT CHARITY
- CHILD HEALTH CHARITY
- EACH AMBERSTONE HOSPITAL CHARITY
- EACH BEECHWOOD CHARITY
- EACH COMMUNITY DRUGS TEAM CHARITY
- EACH CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL CHARITY
- EACH EASTBOURNE DISTRICT NURSES CHARITY
- EACH FIRWOOD HOUSE CHARITY
- EACH GRANGEMEAD CHARITY
- EACH GROVE HOUSE (COMMUNITY HEALTH) CHARITY
- EACH HAILSHAM COMMUNITY NURSING CHARITY
- EACH HEATHFIELD COMMUNITY BASE CHARITY
- EACH HIGHMORE CHARITY
- EACH LEARNING DISABILITIES CHARITY
- EACH MILLWOOD CHARITY
- EACH OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY CHARITY
- EACH PAEDIATRIC DEVELOPMENT UNIT CHARITY
- EACH PALLIATIVE CARE CHARITY
- EACH PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITY
- EACH SAFFRON LODGE CHARITY
- EACH SEAFORD COMMUNITY HEALTH CHARITY
- EACH SEAFORD DAY HOSPITAL CHARITY
- EACH UCKFIELD DISTRICT NURSES CHARITY
- EACH UCKFIELD HOSPITAL CHARITY
- EACH VOLUNTEERS CHARITY
- EAST SUSSEX COUNTY HEALTHCARE GENERAL FUND CHARITY
- EASTBOURNE DOWNS GENERAL FUND CHARITY
- FAMILY PLANNING CHARITY
- FIRWOOD REHABILITATION CHARITY
- HILL RISE DAY CENTRE CHARITY
- LEARNING DISABILITY SERVICE
- LEWES COMMUNITY NURSES CHARITY
- LEWES VICTORIA HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FUND
- MEADOW LODGE CHARITABLE FUND
- NEWHAVEN CMHT
- NEWHAVEN REHABILITATION CENTRE CHARITY
- PATIENTS WELFARE CHARITY
- SCOTT UNIT CHARITY
- STAFF FUND CHARITY
- SUSSEX DOWNS & WEALD GENERAL FUND CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST DRUG DEPENDENCY CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST GROVE HOUSE (ELDERLY MENTAL HEALTH) CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST HOMEFIELD PLACE CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST MENTAL HEALTH CARE CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST MILTON COURT CHARITY
- SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST ROBOROUGH DAY HOSPITAL CHARITY
- THE BERG FUND FOR THE ELDERLY
- THE SUSSEX PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- 16 June 2004 : Standard registration
- 03 November 2006 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heads On
Portland House
44 Richmond Road
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN11 1HS
- Phone:
- 07824496079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window