CINDERFORD AREA NEIGHBOURHOOD DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth projects - drop-in centres, dance groups, homework club, arts and drama Community projects - Women's Space, Lunch Club, Garden Club Providing community locations for other charities - mental health, children's sports and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,455 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 January 1996: Standard registration
- C A N D I (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham John Spearman | Chair | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Lansell Davies | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Sheppard | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Diane Abolins | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Roy Bardo | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Abolins | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER RADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.11k | £3.12k | £20.88k | £39.37k | £36.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £14.67k | £14.91k | £26.98k | £39.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.24k | N/A | £10.50k | £16.22k | £7.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JANUARY 1996, AS AMENDED 22 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES OF CINDERFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA IN ORDER TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO ENCOURAGE INITIATIVES AND DEVELOPMENTS WITHIN THOSE COMMUNITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
CINDERFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Candi
31 Market Street
CINDERFORD
Gloucestershire
GL14 2RT
- Phone:
- 07766 118627
- Email:
- cosec@candi.email
- Website:
-
candi.website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window