THE ROCHFORD PLAY OFFICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Essex
Governance
- 04 January 1996: Standard registration
- 11 September 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 1994 AND AMENDED 13 DECEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND HOLIDAYS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PLAYSCHEMES AND AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS WITH FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE ROCHFORD DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window