COVENTRY CROSS MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coventry Cross Mosque is a charitable organisation providing evening Islamic and moral education for local Muslims as well as daily congregational prayers for adults. It promotes responsible and respectful Islamic values, supporting the spiritual and social well-being of the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 10 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MONIR UDDIN | Chair | 08 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JASIM UDDIN | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL HADEE | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED LUDU MIAH | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL AZIZ SARDAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.51k | £42.96k | £30.60k | £31.24k | £102.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.90k | £17.43k | £16.56k | £22.92k | £36.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION (11)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE MANY FACETS OF THE ISLAMIC CULTURE (111)TO RELIEVE POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
Broxbourne House
Empson Street
London
E3 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07958377969
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window