R M JOLLY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To make donations to any charitable organisations as the trustees may from time to time determine

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £9,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR R M JOLLY FCA Chair
None on record
MRS G M JOLLY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £0 £20.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £56.00k £5.00k £33.06k £9.00k £9.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Limes Developments Ltd
Middle Street
Burton
Lincoln
LN1 2RB
Phone:
01522543577
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available