Financial history MIDDLEWICH PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1051786
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £359.70k £421.84k £551.47k £574.99k £0
Total expenditure £428.55k £402.64k £478.88k £562.52k £0
Income from government contracts £265.95k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.90k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £55.78k £65.29k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £28.27k £55.53k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £463.89k £432.00k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £360 £162 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £3.16k £22.01k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £478.88k £562.52k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £7.60k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A