Financial history HOPE CORNER

Charity Number: 1051787
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £92.46k £126.31k £154.24k £164.00k £181.68k
Total expenditure £103.74k £132.46k £140.44k £162.29k £154.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A