MID SURREY DEMENTIA CARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate the Conservatory Club, attached to Fairfield Centre, Leatherhead, where we run a managed social club for up to 8 people with memory difficulties each day, between 10.00 - 3.00pm, Monday to Friday. While these people with memory difficulties are at the Club, their carers enjoy 5 hrs/day of free time
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 January 1996: Standard registration
- THE CONSERVATORY CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glynis Peterkin | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Noel Timothy Tennent | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Bond | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Anne Walton | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Slater | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ELAINE ARGO HILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.19k | £19.02k | £18.23k | £34.62k | £47.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.27k | £17.56k | £23.00k | £36.88k | £46.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.16k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEF OF AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THOSE NEEDING CARE AS A RESULT OF DEMENTIA. (2) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Kelmscott Place
ASHTEAD
KT21 2HD
- Phone:
- 01372270138
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window