BALDOCK DISTRICT GUIDES

Charity Number: 1051815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Girlguiding Baldock District is the operating name of Baldock District Guides and is part of Girlguiding, the operating name of the Guide Association. Girlguiding enables girls and young women to develop their potential and to make a difference to the world through a stimulating and enjoyable programme of activities, delivered by trained volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £5,146
Total expenditure: £5,191

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Dumitrescu Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
Vanessa Ann Robson Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Rosie Claire Alsop Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
Lisa Ann Patterson Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Susan Mary Chapman Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.71k £6.03k £3.20k £3.98k £5.15k
Total expenditure £10.49k £6.58k £6.59k £3.94k £5.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 16 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Girlguiding Hertfordshire
County Office
Cottered
BUNTINGFORD
SG9 9QP
Phone:
01763281311