NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services of worship (Sundays) Christian teaching of youth and young people (Sundays) Children's after school club, alpha course, home groups, community outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 08 January 1996: Standard registration
- NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE - COLNE PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Dingle | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hindle | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Street | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JIMMY NOWAB | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MANN | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|||||
GLEN THRELFALL | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUNE WICK | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.15k | £36.86k | £51.03k | £46.05k | £56.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.97k | £38.94k | £42.16k | £74.43k | £57.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1993 AND CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE COLNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 WEST STREET
COLNE
LANCASHIRE
BB8 0HP
- Phone:
- 01282871721
- Email:
- nlcc.colne@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
newlifecolne.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window