Warrington and Halton Teaching Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Warrington and Halton Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust Charitable Fund is to provide for any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service wholly or mainly for the services provided by Warrington and Halton Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Halton
- Warrington
Governance
- 23 March 2004: Standard registration
- Warrington and Halton Hospitals Charity (Working name)
- NORTH CHESHIRE HOSPITALS CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- WARRINGTON AND HALTON HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (Previous name)
- WARRINGTON HOSPITAL NHS CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WARRINGTON AND HALTON HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.23k | £467.00k | £132.53k | £338.67k | £242.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.35k | £319.00k | £314.17k | £173.74k | £252.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 16 MARCH 2010 as amended on 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 23 March 2004 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Warrington & Halton Hospitals NHS
Foundation Trust
Warrington Hospital
Lovely Lane
WARRINGTON
WA5 1QG
- Phone:
- 01925662666
- Email:
- whh.charity@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window