LITTLE ACORNS (ULVERSTON) PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Acorns is a non profit registered charity run by a voluntary management committee made up of parents and members of the local community. The parent elected committee employ staff and carry out administration and financial planning of the pre-school nursery and out of school clubs. Fees cover salaries and day to day expenses only, we have to fund raise for learning resources and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 10 January 1996: Standard registration
- 16 April 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 November 2014: Re-registered
- 09 July 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CROFTLANDS PRE SCHOOL NURSERY CROFTLANDS PRE SCHOO (Working name)
- CROFTLANDS INFANT SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- CROFTLANDS PRE- SCHOOL (Previous name)
- CROFTLANDS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- CROFTLANDS PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 29/02/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.56k | £60.34k | £148.02k | £210.27k | £185.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.03k | £52.69k | £127.41k | £211.84k | £205.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £17.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 06 July 2020 | 372 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 06 July 2020 | 372 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 01 July 2020 | 732 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 01 July 2020 | 732 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 14 March 2018 | 257 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 14 March 2018 | 257 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1997 AND 14TH AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window