Financial history CHAPEL HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1051877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.08k £43.74k £48.37k £58.17k £73.33k
Total expenditure £43.09k £42.73k £53.07k £49.20k £61.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A