CARERS TOGETHER IN HAMPSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carers Together provides support with/for carers of any age. It includes: information, advice, support, advocacy, benefits advice, personal support planning, carers respite/take-a-break service, training/awareness for carers & professionals. It organises community information drop-ins, carers support groups & network events, free telephone emotional support, computer support & mobile information
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 10 January 1996: Standard registration
- CARERS TOGETHER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ROSWITA THOMAS | Chair | 05 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Marion Ward | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
David Walter Crocker | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|||||||
MR KEN MEADER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANNE MEADER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.41k | £256.78k | £257.96k | £156.18k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.61k | £169.22k | £182.16k | £139.43k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £76.20k | £145.21k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AS DEFINED IN THE CARERS (RECOGNITION AND SERVICES) ACT 1995, OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT OR ILLNESS, PARTICULARLY BY BRINGING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LOVE LANE
ROMSEY
HAMPSHIRE
SO51 8DE
- Phone:
- 01794519495
- Email:
- info@carerstogether.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window