Accounts and annual returns FARNHAM VOLUNTARY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051896
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 01 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 01 May 2009 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time