EMMANUEL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORSHIP MEETINGS TO TEACH AND ENCOURAGE CHRISTIANS IN THEIR FAITH OUTREACH EVENTS TO LOCALS AND VISITORS WEEKLY WARM SPACE FOOD BANK (FOODSHARE NORTH WALES) SMALL GROUPS MEETING IN HOMES FOR FELLOWSHIP, PRAYER AND STUDY SUPPORT OF MISSION AND COMMUNITY PROJECTS AND WORKERS IN THE UK AND ABROAD HOSTING OTHER CHARITABLE, CHRISTIAN OR LOCAL COMMUNITY EVENTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Conwy
Governance
- 12 January 1996: Standard registration
- KINGDOM KRAFTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Russell | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|||||
MR MIKE PICTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE PICTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.28k | £132.70k | £35.12k | £41.62k | £46.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.10k | £116.72k | £40.40k | £49.52k | £50.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH JULY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHURCH EXISTS FOR THE PROCLAIMING AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD, AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LLANDUDNO
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jabez
Herkomer Road
LLANDUDNO
LL30 2YZ
- Phone:
- 01492478395
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window