OSSETT AND HORBURY ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ossett and Horbury Round Table Charitable Trust fundraises in its local community, and makes grants to Childrens and Adults Groups in and around its geographical location. We also use funds raised to support Community Events, such as the Senior Citizen's Party.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 12 January 1996: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- OSSETT & HORBURY ROUND TABLE (Working name)
- OSSETT AND HORBURY ROUND TABLE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £3.16k | £3.20k | £2.38k | £2.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39k | £2.04k | £1.81k | £2.10k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 15 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE U.K. OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window