DUNSWELL VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering indoor and outdoor leisure facilities used by various groups including a number of sports groups eg football, youth club, fitness classes and private parties. A large proportion of the facilities are used by the local school, Dunswell Academy. We now have two mentally and physically disabled groups using the facilities on a regular basis, because of the privacy the facilities offer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Keith McWatt | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Brown | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hunt | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Claire Oxtoby | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Brown | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marie Reveley | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Richard Brown | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Alison Barker | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Dawn Watson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ros Jump | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joe Russell | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LESLEY COCKERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KERRY FLEMING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.22k | £24.00k | £31.63k | £57.18k | £22.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.13k | £15.15k | £17.50k | £87.44k | £21.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 31 December 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 31 December 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 04 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
A.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATRION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE VILLAGE OF DUNSWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ship Inn
Beverley Road
Dunswell
HULL
HU6 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01482859160
- Email:
- dunswellinstitute@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window