Financial history SHREE SATTAVIS GAM PATIDAR SAMAJ (EUROPE)

Charity number: 1051926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £419.32k £124.18k £257.03k £398.31k £417.01k
Total expenditure £416.69k £285.32k £496.18k £334.73k £339.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A