COURTEENHALL 1672 FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants to individual children and young people for educational and training purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN HEREWARD WAKE | Chair | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Fitzgerald | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darron Wilks | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57k | £2.08k | £2.17k | £3.16k | £34.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £450 | £2.05k | £1.98k | £73.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEFRAYOUT OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS THEREON) AND ALL OTHER CHARGES AND OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN REPSECT THEREOF AND ALL THE PROPOER COSTS, CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COURTEENHALL AND IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ESTATE OFFICE
COURTEENHALL ESTATE
COURTEENHALL
NORTHANTS
NN7 2QD
- Phone:
- 01604659222
- Email:
- info@courteenhall.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window