ABERKENFIG MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Church Aberkenfig provides Sunday services for worshippers in the Aberkenfig area. In unity with 4 other local churches, the church serves the local community through the Storehouse Project. The church also operates a food bank, a youth group and a craft project for the socially isolated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
Governance
- 12 January 1996: Standard registration
- ABERKENFIG BIBLE CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Mary SHEPPARD | Chair | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Teresa Alice Madden | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROY FRANCIS BLAKE | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.20k | £75.67k | £68.27k | £50.36k | £61.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.40k | £73.12k | £79.31k | £55.06k | £29.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | £493 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 18 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND OF THE AGED. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Adare Street
Ogmore Vale
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF32 7HG
- Phone:
- 01656841489
- Email:
- ourcca@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window