Accounts and annual returns NEW BEGINNINGS CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity Number: 1051960
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2011 02 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2011 08 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 08 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 10 November 2009 On Time