Financial history NEW BEGINNINGS CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity Number: 1051960
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 04/04/2011
Total gross income £44.42k £50.51k £57.67k £59.61k £76.59k
Total expenditure £44.12k £48.66k £59.41k £59.88k £60.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A