NEW BEGINNINGS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday and weeknight services Parent & Toddler (Tuesday & Wednesday a.m.) Powerpack childrens club (Thursday evening) Ladies coffee morning (1st Monday in month) Mens group every Monday evening Ladies group (3rd Tuesday evening in month) Food project for destitute asylum seekers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 January 1996: Standard registration
- 25 June 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 June 2012: Funds transferred to 1142639 NEW BEGINNINGS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
- WHEATLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- WHEATLEY PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 04/04/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.42k | £50.51k | £57.67k | £59.61k | £76.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.12k | £48.66k | £59.41k | £59.88k | £60.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2011 | 02 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2011 | 08 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 26 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 08 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 21 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 10 November 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED 11 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HALIFAX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window