THE MILLERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was established for general charitable purposes, in particular to provide residential accommodation for the elderly and for the making of discretionary donations to young people, who are interested in developing their skills in the field of theatre and arts. The charity is also now looking to support, by donation, organisations involved in medical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Richard Castle FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anne Elizabeth Miller | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.49k | £10.00k | £117 | £5.17k | £20.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.17k | £13.50k | £4.69k | £8.80k | £17.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLE OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 1995 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 DECEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEEDS, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF OLD AGE AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMODATION, NURSING HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS;(2)SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
185 Silverdale Avenue
Walton-on-Thames
KT12 1EL
- Phone:
- 01932229093
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window