Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF SHREWSBURY SEVERN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1051992
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 September 2024 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required