Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SHREWSBURY SEVERN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1051992
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £22.25k £22.78k £22.65k £35.97k £11.90k
Total expenditure £21.02k £26.23k £32.07k £26.05k £17.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A