Accounts and annual returns THE KENNEDY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1052001
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 April 2025 444 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 May 2022 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required