Financial history THE ENDERBY BAND ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 1052030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.37k £36.10k £27.78k £34.48k £50.71k
Total expenditure £54.27k £15.65k £27.48k £27.81k £40.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.50k £3.00k N/A N/A