THE ROYAL ULSTER RIFLES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the volunteer units of the Royal Irish Regiment with limited funding in lieu of COPF. The entitled formations are 2 R IRISH and LIR Company of The London Regiment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 16 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLONEL HUBERT MCALLISTER OBE TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL ERNEST TELFORD TD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81k | £1.90k | £1.87k | £2.11k | £2.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £1.25k | £1.46k | £1.93k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 20TH OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
1.PROMOTION OF MILITARY EFFICIENCY OF THE REGIMENT, INCLUDING THE TERRITORIAL ARMY UNITS, 'D' (LONDON IRISH RIFLES) COMPANY (LONDON IRISH) OF THE LONDON REGIMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2. RELIEVING GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE EXISITING AND FORMER REGIMENTS, INCLUDING ANY UNIT OF THE TERITORIAL ARMY, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE REGIMENTAL
ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER
2 ROYAL IRISH
Thiepval Barracks
LISBURN
BT28 3NP
- Phone:
- 02892262142
- Email:
- 2rirish-bhq-rao@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window