Financial history PLAY AND RECYCLING CENTRE

Charity number: 1052059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.68k £73.29k £45.66k £31.83k £71.88k
Total expenditure £71.26k £46.75k £61.17k £45.18k £51.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.75k N/A N/A N/A