Accounts and annual returns THE KENT AND MEDWAY COMMUNITY CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1052079
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 08 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 06 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 06 January 2010 On Time