Accounts and annual returns EXMOUTH AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE GORDON MATHER HOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 1052122
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 June 2024 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 September 2022 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 August 2021 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required