THE CORY BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- The development of Brass Band music as an art form through dedicated rehearsals of all genres of music and performances in concerts, competitions and recordings. - The band is dedicated to supporting the existence of the Brass Bands in Wales through youth development via Cory Academy. - Player Development - Commissioning of new music for the Brass Band repertoire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 19 January 1996: Standard registration
- BUY AS YOU VIEW BAND (Working name)
- CORY BAND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN SOUTHCOMBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NEIL BLOCKLEY | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT AUSTIN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.71k | £164.94k | £154.65k | £204.56k | £274.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.44k | £117.16k | £142.28k | £223.35k | £175.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £101.88k | £49.94k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 February 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 February 2024 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL ARTS, AND IT PARTICULAR,THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ART BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES. ADDITIONALLY TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT THE COMMITTEE SHALL DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Cory
Former Hebron Chapel
Church Street
Ton Pentre
Rhondda Cynon Taff
CF41 7AD
- Phone:
- 01443778396
- Email:
- j.southcombe@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window