Trustees THE GATE CHURCH (PRUDHOE)

Charity number: 1052138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Egbert Boonstra Chair 01 September 2016
None on record
Gemma Davison Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
David Foster Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Simon Hobson Trustee 12 February 2022
None on record
Ruth Bowler Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Margaret Boonstra Trustee 31 January 2017
None on record