Financial history RESTORE CHURCH BOSTON

Charity number: 1052142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £87.87k £173.37k £229.36k £323.58k £393.06k
Total expenditure £91.78k £123.72k £250.49k £315.54k £389.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £34.02k N/A £1.74k N/A