WILD THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company has been dormant with seasonal meetings and leisure activities relating to theatrical workshops and drama.The company has been running in a limited capacity and is optimistic of resuming a full programme of events in the near future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 January 1996: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- WILD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07k | £1.45k | £150 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24k | £2.03k | £1.16k | £0 | £70 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 26 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 15 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG DISABLED PERSONS IN NEED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DRAMA AND DANCE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window